Meredith v. Baldwin Piano Inc

Plaintiff: Lizzie A Meredith
Defendant: Baldwin Piano Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00046
Filed: March 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendant's post-judgment discovery requests within 14 days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/12/2010. (jct)
April 8, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay writ of garnishment & post judgment proceedings on appeal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/8/2010. (jct)
January 26, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Bill of Costs filed by Baldwin Piano Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/26/2010. (jct)
November 23, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 69 Memorandum Opinion And Order, in favor of Baldwin Piano Inc against Lizzie A Meredith. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed; relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/23/09. (jct)
November 4, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the 11/16/09 trial in this matter due to a scheduling conflict. A motion for summary judgment is pending, & a new trial date will be scheduled, if necessary, once the motion has been resolved. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/4/09. (jct)
October 7, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's verbal motion for an extension of time to file a response to 53 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response is due on 10/13/09. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/7/09. (jct)
January 30, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, which the Court considers as a motion for entry of a default judgment. The Court will enter a new scheduling order setting this case for trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/30/09. (jct)
January 6, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, finding it more appropriate to consider as an application for entry of default judgment under Fed.R.Civ.P.55(b)(2). Plaintiff's motion was based on Defendant's failure t o notify the Court of its substituted counsel. Defendant has 11 days from the date of entry of this Order to show cause why a default judgment should not be entered. The trial of this matter scheduled for 1/12/09 is continued. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/6/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith v. Baldwin Piano Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizzie A Meredith
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin Piano Inc
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?