Hogan v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London

Plaintiff: Mark Hogan
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Case Number: 3:2008cv00073
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs & attorney's fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/24/09. (jct)
March 2, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that documents Defendant produced to the Court regarding certain correspondence & claims routing sheets are privileged, and Defendant has not waived the privilege by identifying Mark Breeding as a witness. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/09. (jct)
February 23, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 18 2/11/09 Telephone Conference, regarding discovery in this cause of action. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/23/09. (jct)
February 11, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER advising counsel of telephone conference scheduled for 1:30 p.m. on 2/11/09; counsel is advised to be prepared re the issue of the expert's report. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/11/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hogan
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?