Chatt et al v. West Memphis Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Rosie Mae Chatt and Dewayne Chatt, Jr
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of, Samuel Malone, Steven Jackson, John Does and Richard Busby
Case Number: 3:2008cv00096
Filed: July 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending 22 June 8, 2009 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, to state that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice subject to the following condition: if the pltfs re-file this action against the County, the Court will set a date by wh ich they must file a response to the County's motion for summary judgment; no other activity in the re-filed case regarding the County will proceed until the Court rules on the County's 24 MOTION for Reconsideration,filed by Richard Busby . Motions terminated: 24 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Richard Busby granted in part; the Clerk is directed to send plaintiffs a copy of this Order at 220 South 16th Street, West Memphis, Arkansas 72301. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/17/09. (mkf)
June 8, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss & dismissing this complaint without prejudice; denying as moot 17 Defendant Busby's Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss retained counsel because the complaint has been dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/8/09. (jct) Modified on 7/17/2009 to reflect this Order has been amended pursuant to 27 Order . (mkf).
May 12, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 MOTION to Withdraw by Don Trimble as Attorney for Plaintiffs; granting 14 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to the extent that the parties have until 5/18/09 in which to complete discovery. The Court hereby directs remaining counsel for Plaintiffs, Javier Bailey, who has been admitted to appear pro hac vice, to provide the Court with the name, address & telephone number of local counsel with whom the Court may communicate regarding this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/12/09. (jct)
April 8, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Samuel Malone & Steven Jackson. The Court further finds that separate Defendants City of West Memphis & John Does should be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a). The dismissals are without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/8/2009. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatt et al v. West Memphis Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Mae Chatt
Represented By: Don E. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Chatt, Jr
Represented By: Don E. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?