Watson v. J C Penney Corporation Inc et al

Plaintiff: Betty Watson
Defendant: J C Penney Corporation Inc and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2008cv00110
Filed: July 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of J C Penney Corporation Inc against Betty Watson, pursuant to 38 Jury Verdict. The complaint of Betty Watson is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/23/09. (jct)
September 15, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ( Jury Trial before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes rescheduled for 9/22/2009 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 ). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/09. (jct)
June 11, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 J.C. Penney Corp's Motion in Limine; granting 18 J.C. Penney Corp's Motion in Limine; granting 20 J.C. Penney Corp's Motion in Limine; granting 22 J.C. Penney Corp's Motion in Limine without prejudice to plaintiff's argument that she is permitted to inquire in voir dire as to whether any prospective juror owns stock in or works for a liability insurance company. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/11/09. (jct)
April 29, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 unopposed MOTION to Continue filed by Betty Watson. Jury Trial rescheduled for 9/21/09 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324. The discovery & motion deadlines provided in 6 Final Scheduling Order remain in force. If counsel wish to bring electronic devices to the Courthouse for any proceeding, please note General Order No. 54. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/29/09. (jct)
April 24, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER directing counsel to report to Courtroom #324 in Jonesboro, Arkansas, by 8:30 a.m. on Monday, May 4, 2009 to begin jury selection for the trial of this matter as previously scheduled in 6 Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. J C Penney Corporation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Watson
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C Penney Corporation Inc
Represented By: Mindy D. Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?