Hawkins v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Shannon L Hawkins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv00124
Filed: August 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:206 Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees & Expenses. The Commissioner is directed to certify & pay Plaintiff's attorney an award of attorney's fees in the amount of $6,000, together with expenses of $52.46, for a total of $6,052.46. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/29/2010. (jct)
June 22, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER reversing the Commissioner's decision & remanding this action as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/22/2010. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
July 7, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief filed by Shannon L Hawkins. The Court orders that Defendant serve upon counsel by certified mail a copy of the transcript to his address at Rhine, Rhine & Young, 120 North 2nd Street, Paragould, AR 72450, by 7/27/09. Plaintiff's Brief is due by 9/15/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/7/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon L Hawkins
Represented By: Robert Patrick Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?