Walker v. Arkansas Department of Community Correction

Plaintiff: Dianna C Walker
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Community Correction
Case Number: 3:2008cv00131
Filed: August 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 63 Order entered this date, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/2011. (jct)
January 24, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing the following named individuals to bring electronic devices into the U.S. Federal Building & Courthouse in Jonesboro between 1/31/11 & 2/2/11 subject to the stated rules: Chalk S. Mitchell, Dianna C. Walker, Diana McCullar, Jeanette Redditt, Janiece Kelley, Susan Lester, Dave Johnson, Rebecca Whitaker & Kimberly Witherspoon. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/24/2011. (jct)
August 2, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss filed by Arkansas Department of Community Correction. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/2/2010. (jct)
April 30, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential documents in this cause of action; granting 41 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Arkansas Department of Community Correction. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/30/2010. (jct)
January 12, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default; denying as moot 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing on Clerk's Default. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/12/2010. (jct)
October 24, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising Plaintiff of her responsibility to familiarize herself with, and comply with, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/24/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Arkansas Department of Community Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Community Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?