Hendricks v. Pediatric Specialty Care Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tracy Hendricks
Defendant: Pediatric Specialty Care Inc, Linda Shempert and Robin Bevill
Case Number: 3:2008cv00134
Filed: August 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Pediatric Specialty Care Inc, Linda Shempert, Robin Bevill against Tracy Hendricks pursuant to 60 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/4/2010. (jct)
November 30, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER, re 50 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment, if a response is not filed by 12/14/09, the motion will be granted. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/30/09. (jct)
March 2, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's appointed counsel, Jerry D. Roberts, to contact Tenesha Jones, Courtroom Deputy to Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr., within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/2/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Pediatric Specialty Care Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pediatric Specialty Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Shempert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Bevill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?