Banks v. Greene County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Heath Banks
Defendant: Greene County, Arkansas, Greene County Quorum Court, Greene County Sheriff's Department, Tim Cavaness, Dan Langston, Jesse Dollars and Joe Perry
Case Number: 3:2008cv00138
Filed: August 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 29 Order entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/19/2010. (jct)
September 2, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 JOINT MOTION to Continue. This matter is rescheduled for jury trial during the week of 4/12/2010, commencing at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock, Arkansas. The Court extends the following deadlines: (Discovery due by 2/15/2010, Motions due by 3/1/2010, Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 3/15/2010). All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/2/09. (jct)
November 3, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 15 OF Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr., as this Court's findings in all respects. The Court GRANTS 3 MOTION to Dismiss Greene County Sheriff's Department & 10 MOTION to Dismiss Jo e Perry. Plaintiff's allegations against defendant Greene County Sheriff's Department are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's allegations against defendant Joe Perry are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/3/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Greene County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Banks
Represented By: F. David Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Quorum Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Cavaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Dollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?