Curtis v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Roy William Curtis
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv00142
Filed: September 2, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:206 Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 20 Memorandum Opinion And Order entered this date, in favor of Defendant & against Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/23/09. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ)
March 31, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Plaintiff's Fourth MOTION to Extend Time within which to file Brief. Plaintiff's Brief deadline is extended to & including 4/30/09. Defendant's brief shall be due 42 days after Plaintiff's brief is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/31/09. (jct)
March 2, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff's Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief. Plaintiff's brief deadline is extended to 3/16/09. Defendant's brief shall be due 42 days from the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/2/09. (jct)
February 3, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief. Plaintiff's brief deadline is 2/20/09. Defendant's brief shall be due 42 days from the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/3/09. (jct)
December 29, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief filed by Roy William Curtis. Plaintiff's brief deadline extended to & including 1/26/09. Defendant's brief shall be due 42 days from the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/29/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy William Curtis
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?