Smith v. Etter
Plaintiff: Cornelius Marquel Smith
Defendant: Mike Etter
Case Number: 3:2008cv00153
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JUDGMENT, pursuant to 76 Order of Dismissal entered this date, in favor of Defendant Mike Etter against Plaintiff Cornelius Marquel Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/17/09. (jct)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER reflecting that Plaintiff Cornelius Marquel Smith, ADC #118617, is now incarcerated at the East AR Regional Unit, POB 180, Brickeys, AR 72320-0180, & directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure Plaintiff's appearance at the trial on 9/15/09, at 9:30 a.m., at the U. S. District Court, 615 S. Main, Courtroom #324, in Jonesboro. A copy of this Order has been sent to the ADC inmate transportation coordinator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/09. (jct)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas. The Arkansas Department of Correction is directed to ensure the appearances of Willis Hendrix, ADC #143598, & Kitaka Lauderdale, ADC #143067, currentl y housed at the Pine Bluff Unit, for trial of this action on 9/15/09, in Jonesboro, Arkansas. A copy of this Order has been forwarded to Ms. Lyn Bennett at the ADC. Plaintiff's proposed witnesses Catherine Rena Smith & Johnny James are disallo wed as their testimony will be either unnecessary or redundant to expected testimony of other witnesses. Counsel for Defendant is directed to ensure the appearance of Jeremy Sparks as Plaintiff's named witness for trial. The Craighead County S heriff is directed to ensure Plaintiff's appearance at the trial on 9/15/09, at 9:30 a.m., in Jonesboro. Plaintiff's request for production of a video tape is DENIED as the Court cannot order the Defendant to produce something that no longer exists. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/9/09. (jct)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 41 Defendant Etter's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/23/09. (jct)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER, re 41 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment, notifying Plaintiff of his opportunity to file a response w/i 10 days of this Order's entry date. Under Local Rule 56.1 of the Rules of the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, Plaintiff is also advised to file a separate, short & concise statement setting forth the facts which he thinks need to be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/10/09. (jct)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Defendant's First MOTION to Continue Trial Date. The 7/20/09 trial date is continued & the Court will issue a new scheduling order consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/22/08. (jct)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Adopting 13 Partial Report and Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety; Pltf's due process claim is dismissed without prejudice and all claims against Defendant McCain are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/7/08. (mkf)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER advising Plaintiff if he wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $350 filing fee to the Court within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/23/08. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Etter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Marquel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Etter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?