Gray v. McCann et al

Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray
Defendant: Jack McCann, John Smith and Steve Metcalf
Case Number: 3:2008cv00154
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 58 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, this case is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants on all claims set forth herein. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/28/09. (jct)
June 4, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting [49-1] & 52 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment up to & including 7/24/09; denying [49-2] Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel. The Court grants [49-1] Pl aintiff's Motion for Copies of Defendant's Summary Judgment papers & Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff copies of 42 , 43 , 44 & the Court's 5/5/09 Order 47 . The 7/28/09 Evidentiary Hearing is CANCELLED & all remaining deadlines in the 1/7/09 Scheduling Order are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/4/09. (jct)
December 1, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to Plaintiff notifying the Court that he has been released from custody, he is directed to file, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, a fully and properly completed Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/1/08. (jct)
October 7, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send this Order & a prisoner trust fund calculation sheet to the Sheriff of Craighead County. The Court requests that the Sheriff of Craighead County ensure that the prisoner trust fund calculation sheet is completed by an authorized Craighead County official & returned to this Court w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/7/08. (jct)
September 22, 2008 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff, within 30 days of the entry of this Order, to either pay the $350 filing fee in full; or file a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, along with a properly completed prisoner calculation sheet. Further, Plaintiff is directed to file, within 30 days of the entry of this Order, an Amended Complaint containing the information specified. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly comply with any portion of this Order will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/22/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. McCann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?