LaRue v. Staffmark

Plaintiff: Jodene LaRue
Defendant: Staffmark
Case Number: 3:2008cv00156
Filed: September 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; The Clerk of the Court shall disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $480.90 and distribute it to the named applicant; a copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/31/09. (mkf)
May 12, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's age discrimination claim is dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/12/09. (jct)
April 8, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Staffmark, directing Plaintiff to file any supplemental response to the motion to dismiss within 15 days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/8/2009. (jct)
April 1, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 28 Initial Scheduling Order, the Rule 26(f) report was due by 2/11/09. The report has not been filed. The parties are directed to file their Rule 26(f) Report no later than 4/29/2009. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/1/09. (jct)
October 29, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising plaintiff of her responsibility to be familiar and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of plaintiff's claim. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/29/08. (jct)
October 14, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file within 30 days an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff must state specific facts supporting her claim that Staffmark discriminated and retaliated against her. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/14/08. (jct)
September 24, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order to specify the facts upon which her claims are based. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/24/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRue v. Staffmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staffmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?