LaRue v. Denso Manufacturing Arkansas Inc

Plaintiff: Jodene LaRue
Defendant: Denso Manufacturing Arkansas Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00157
Filed: September 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 50 Order entered this date, Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Denso Manufacturing Arkansas, Inc. against Plaintiff Jodene LaRue. The Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/31/09. (jct)
June 24, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Claim for Age Discrimination. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/24/09. (jct)
November 4, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 2 Complaint & 6 Amended Complaint filed by Jodene LaRue, advising Plaintiff the Court will allow her one more opportunity to amend her complaint to specify the facts upon which her claims are based. Plaintiff may choose to file a Title VII complaint form for her amended complaint, making sure this time to follow the instructions and provide all the information called for on the complaint form. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/4/08. (jct)
September 25, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order to specify the facts upon which her claims are based. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/25/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRue v. Denso Manufacturing Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denso Manufacturing Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?