Baldwin v. Christensen et al

Plaintiff: Mike Baldwin
Defendant: Sean Christensen and Star Transport Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00162
Filed: October 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Mike Baldwin from Defendant Star Transport, Inc. in the sum of $160,000.00, together with interest at 6.5% per annum from date of Judgment until paid, together with cost of Court. All relief not specifically granted herein is denied. This is a Final Judgment disposing of all issues & all parties, & all prior interlocutory Orders of the Court in this cause are hereby made final. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/26/2010. (jct)
December 4, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER, re 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants by Kara B. Mikles & 32 Letter Order to Attorney Mikles, advising Defendants Star Transport Inc & Sean Christensen that the Court anticipates entering an Order removing Ms. Mikles as their counsel of record on 12/11/09, & any comments regarding this should be made before that date. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/4/09. (jct)
November 30, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER, re 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants, regarding substitute counsel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/30/09. (jct)
April 16, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying w/o prejudice 12 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery; granting 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff is directed to provide Defendants with answers to the discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on 4/30/09. If Defendants are not satisfied with Plaintiff's responses to the discovery, they may refile the motion to compel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/16/09. (jct)
April 13, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Attorney Gene E. McKissic, re 12 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Discovery, advising if no response is filed by 5:00 p.m. on 4/17/09, the motion will be granted. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/13/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Christensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Baldwin
Represented By: Gene E. McKissic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?