Lemmon v. Flash Market Inc

Plaintiff: Bruce C Lemmon
Defendant: Flash Market Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00191
Filed: November 24, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. The 3/15/2010 trial date is removed from the Court's docket & all pending motions ( 45 , 47 , 49 , 50 , 52 & 54 ) are dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/11/2010. (jct)
March 9, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reflecting the jury trial will begin 3/15/2010 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Judge James M. Moody. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2010 at 8:30 AM ) Counsel should fax trial witness list & exhibit list no later than 3/ 11/2010; trial brief and/or jury instructions due no later than 3/10/2010. Pursuant to General Order 54, Cameron Charles McCree, Kristine Baker & Sheila Campbell are authorized to bring electronic devises to the trial. Signed by Donna Jackson at the Direction of the Court on 3/9/2010. (jct)
March 4, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 & 26 Defendant's Motion & Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/4/2010. (jct)
December 1, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential discovery information. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/1/2009. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmon v. Flash Market Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce C Lemmon
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flash Market Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?