Goss v. Craighead County Jail et al

Case Number: 3:2008cv00197
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 44 Memorandum Opinion entered this date, this case is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, & Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Memorandum Opinion would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/23/09. (jct)
July 8, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 37 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment, directing Plaintiff to file a response on or before 7/19/09. IT IS ORDERED that the 8/5/09 non-jury trial is CANCELLED, & all remaining deadlines imposed in the 29 Scheduling Order are VACATED. The Court will reschedule a non-jury trial, if necessary, after it rules upon the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/8/09. (jct)
June 15, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 37 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment, directing Plaintiff to file, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, a Response & Statement of Disputed Material Facts that comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 56, Local Rule 56.1 & the instructions s et forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order could result in: (a) dismissal of this action, without prejudice; or, (b) all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/15/09. (jct)
March 2, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 21 Notice of Change of Address filed by Kerry Deon Goss, directing him to file, within 30 days of the entry of this Order: (a) a Statement indicating whether he wishes to continue with this lawsuit; and (2) an Amended (freeworld) Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/2/09. (jct)
February 3, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 15 Answer, the Clerk shall amend the docket to correctly reflect the Defendants as "County Judge Dale Haas"; "Sheriff Jack McCann"; & "Steve Metcalf". Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/3/09. (jct)
January 8, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT Defendant Craighead County Jail is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, because it is not amenable to suit in a Section 1983 action. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Defendants Money, McCainn, Smith & Metcalf, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the Defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/8/2009. (jct)
December 3, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kerry Deon Goss, directing him to file within 30 days of entry of this Order his properly completed prisoner trust fund calculation sheet. Further, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint, containing the information specified, within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to timely & properly comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/3/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goss v. Craighead County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?