Cooper v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: Martin E Cooper, III
Defendant: Thomas Martin, Dick Busby and Crittenden County, Arkansas
Case Number: 3:2009cv00006
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 36 Order entered this date, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED & this case is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/14/2011. (jct)
January 12, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Defendants' MOTION to Stay Case During Interlocutory Appeal. The parties should notify the Court once the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals has issued a ruling. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/12/2010. (jct)
January 4, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The case remains on the court trial calendar for 1/26/2010 in Jonesboro. If the parties believe a settlement conference would be beneficial, they should forthwith contact Ms. Mary Johnson. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/4/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin E Cooper, III
Represented By: Gerald A. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?