Gray v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa Gray
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Dewayne A Graves, Randy E Buckner, Hosie Gladney and Kim Williams
Case Number: 3:2009cv00010
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by Vanessa Gray. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, on the condition that before Plaintiff may re-file an action against Defendant arising from the same facts & occurrences involved in the present action, she must pay Defendant any costs, expenses & fees incurred by Defendant in this action that will be duplicated because of the re-filing. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/15/2011. (jct)
October 13, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Joint MOTION to Continue. (Jury Trial rescheduled for 6/27/2011 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright; Amended Pretrial Disclosure Sheets, if necessary, may be filed by 5/27/2011.) All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. MOTIONS in Limine 70 & 71 are denied without prejudice & may be refiled prior to the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/13/2010. (jct)
September 14, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Defendant Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's state law claims based on inadequate warnings at the crossing at issue & excessive train speed are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/14/2010. (jct)
July 1, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 without prejudice Defendant Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company's Motion in Limine. Defendant should resubmit the motion at a time closer to trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/1/2010. (jct)
December 29, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's MOTION for an amended Scheduling Order. The Court continues the 4/19/10 jury trial & will set a new trial date & new deadline for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/09. (jct)
September 29, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendants filed by Vanessa Gray. Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendants Dewayne A Graves, Kim Williams, Randy E Buckner and Hosie Gladney are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE & said Defendants are dismissed as parties. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/29/09. (jct)
March 24, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/24/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Gray
Represented By: Ralph C. Hamner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Brandon J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne A Graves
Represented By: Brandon J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy E Buckner
Represented By: Brandon J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosie Gladney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?