Breland & Farmer Designers Inc v. Cancilla et al

Plaintiff: Breland & Farmer Designers Inc
Defendant: Pete Cancilla, Tim K Watson, Josh Brown and Tausha Vowell
Case Number: 3:2009cv00017
Filed: February 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice with respect to all parties, with each party to bear its respective costs & attorney's fees. Breland & Farmer Designers, Inc. is owner of the architectural work titled " EE-1105", which is attached as Exhibt A. The Court ORDERS that the Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, employees & all persons in active concert with them are enjoined as specified. The Court finds that Josh Brown & Natausha Brown, formerly known as Tausha Vowell, have been granted a retroactive license for the home located at 4011 Willow Lane, Paragould, Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/12/2010. (jct)
April 12, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Breland & Farmer Designers Inc's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted on Breland & Farmer's claims that it owns a valid copyright on the EE-1105 house plan & that it may be entitled to statutory damages & attorneys' fees if it prevails on the merits at trial. Breland & Farmer's motion for summary judgment on its claims against Defendants Cancilla & Brown is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/2010. (jct)
July 27, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tim K Watson; denying 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Natausha Brown & Josh Brown. The Court denies 19 Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment against Deft Watson. The request for alternative service is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/09. (jct)
July 22, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising separate defendant Natausha Brown to be familiar & comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may result in default judgment being entered against her. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Natausha Brown by both regular mail & certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/22/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breland & Farmer Designers Inc v. Cancilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breland & Farmer Designers Inc
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Cancilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim K Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tausha Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?