Storm Reconstruction Services Inc v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Storm Reconstruction Services Inc
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Barrett E Harrison and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00021
Filed: February 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 44 Order, dismissing with prejudice the complaint in this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/15/09. (jct)
October 8, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Section 1983 & Arkansas Code Annotated Section 14-58-303 claims as they are without merit. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/8/09. (jct)
September 15, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Trial and to Extend Discovery Deadline. A new trial date with extended discovery & motions deadlines will be issued by separate Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/15/09. (jct)
March 23, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's oral Motion to Withdraw 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The hearing scheduled for 3/26/09 is cancelled & the Clerk of the Court is directed to withdraw the motion & remove the hearing from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/23/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storm Reconstruction Services Inc v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Storm Reconstruction Services Inc
Represented By: Charles S. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?