Export Import Bank of the United States v. Jenney et al

Plaintiff: Export Import Bank of the United States
Defendant: Theodore M Jenney and Stanley J Chiras
Case Number: 3:2009cv00022
Filed: February 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Default of Promissory Note

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 13 MOTION for transfer of proceeding filed by Theodore M Jenney, directing the United States to respond on or before 20 days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/15/2012. (jct)
May 28, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Export Import Bank of the United States against Stanley J Chiras & Theodore M Jenney in the total principal sum of $1,648,353.80, plus interest accrued to 1/31/09 of $133,114.94, & thereafter at the daly rate of $11.83, plus the costs of this action & recoverable charges made during the pendency of this action. Per the terms of the Guaranties, each Defendant is to pay $824,176.90, which represents half of the principal amount, in addition to interest, fees & costs & any reasonable charges. The Court retains jurisdiction of this cause for the making of such further Orders as may be necesary to effectuate this Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/28/09. (jct)
May 12, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/12/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Export Import Bank of the United States v. Jenney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Export Import Bank of the United States
Represented By: Gwendolyn Dewees Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore M Jenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley J Chiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?