Roach Manufacturing Corporation et al v. Northstar Industries Inc et al

Plaintiff: Roach Manufacturing Corporation, Aftersort Inc, Charlie Parks, Gary Carter, John Jaynes and Joe Moody
Defendant: Northstar Industries Inc, Best Diversified Products Inc and Mark Haustein
Case Number: 3:2009cv00029
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1126 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing the following to bring electronic devices, subject to the stated rules, into the U.S. Federal Courthouse in Jonesboro beginning 8/30/11 & each day thereafter until the trial is completed: Chris Averitt, Tony Wilcox, Brandon Lacy, Jim Lyons, David Tyler, Mike Cone, Zac Baker, Jim Markley, Charles Walker, Scott Bridger, John Lehmann & Mark Haustein. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/25/2011. (jct)
August 17, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 40 Defendants' Motion to Strike the affidavit of Charlie Parks. Defendants' 25 Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' clam s of intentional interference with contractual relationships & business expectancies, fraud, unjust enrichment & civil conspiracy and DENIED as to Plaintiffs' claims of patent invalidation, correction of inventor, patent interference, wilful patent infringement & trade secret misappropriations. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/17/2011. (jct)
April 20, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Joint MOTION to Continue 6/13/11 trial date. A new scheduling order will follow. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/20/2011. (jct)
May 6, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information in this cause of action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/2010. (jct)
June 26, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach Manufacturing Corporation et al v. Northstar Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roach Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aftersort Inc
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Parks
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Carter
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jaynes
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Moody
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Diversified Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Haustein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?