Z Contracting Inc v. Associated Engineering and Testing LLC et al

Plaintiff: Z Contracting Inc
Defendant: Associated Engineering and Testing LLC and Cameron Construction Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv00030
Filed: March 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER denying as moot 79 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Motions Other Than Motions in Limine filed by Associated Engineering and Testing LLC., (Motions due by 3/3/2011), pursuant to the Amended Final Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/14/2011. (jct)
January 12, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to the parties wanting to further explore settlement, counsel are to directed to exchange position statements, with a copy to Magistrate Judge Cavaneau personally, no later than 2/3/11. They should NOT file them with the Clerk or submit copies to the trial judge. When the statements have been evaluated, Magistrate Judge Cavaneau will contact the parties & begin renewed negotiations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/12/2011. (jct)
December 14, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the 2/7/11 trial setting on the docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/2010. (jct)
December 6, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Motions. (Motions, except motions in limine, due by 12/23/2010). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/6/2010. (jct)
November 10, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information in this cause of action; granting 52 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/10/2010. (jct)
November 3, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing the following to bring electronic devices to the U.S. Courthouse, 500 W Capitol, Little Rock, on 11/4/10 for a settlement conference, subject to the stated restrictions: Scott Zahn, David Lillehaug, Michael Emerson, Mike Cameron, Roger Gordon, Clay Stone, Kenneth Scrape, John Raynor, Jason Campbell, John Nelson & Trey Scallion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 11/3/2010. (jct)
October 20, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a (Settlement Conference for 11/4/2010 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1B before Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau). The parties are directed to fax a confidential letter per this Order no later than 12:00 noon on 11/2/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/20/2010. (jct)
June 21, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew B. Millis & Emily E. Duke on behalf of Z Contracting. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/21/2010. (jct)
January 28, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 28 Answer to Third Party Complaint & Counterclaim, the Clerk is directed to correct the name of separate defendant NEI Electric Power Engineering Inc to Phrased Right Incorporated d/b/a NEI Electric Power Engineering, Inc. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/28/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Z Contracting Inc v. Associated Engineering and Testing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z Contracting Inc
Represented By: Amy Lee Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Engineering and Testing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Construction Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?