Pruitt v. Craighead County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: James Jermaine Pruitt
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, Tom Morse and Jimmy Fowler
Case Number: 3:2009cv00046
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 29 Order entered this date, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/09. (jct)
July 10, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to provide to the court by 8/10/09 notice of his new address and state whether he wishes to proceed with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/10/09. (bkp)
May 28, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATIONS 6 of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in all respects in its entirety. Plaintiff's claims against the Craighead County Detention Center are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/28/09. (jct)
April 15, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint, providing the information specified, & a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, or pay the $350 filing fee, within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to fully & timely comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/15/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jermaine Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?