Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc v. Dixon Farms Inc et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Defendant: Dixon Farms Inc and Ray Dixon
Case Number: 3:2009cv00055
Filed: April 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 41 Order; directing the United States Marshal to satisfy 34 Judgment by selling the property described in this Order. Wells Fargo will be able to bid up to its judgment amount at the sale without having to pay any additional fun ds and such bid will be deducted from the amount of its judgment. The U.S. Marshal is also ordered to collect its costs and expenses, sell the property, and provide proper notice of the sale. The U.S. Marshal shall set a sale date within thirty days of this order. Excess proceeds, if any, after satisfaction of expenses of the United States Marshal and 34 Judgment shall be paid to defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/18/2013. (jak)
April 17, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the United Sates Marshal to satisfy 34 Judgment by selling the property described as: The east half of the southeast quarter in section 32, less and except highway right-of-way, in Township 15 North, Range 11 East in Mississippi Co unty, Arkansas. Wells Fargo will be able to bid up to its Judgment amount at the sale without having to pay any additional funds and such bid will be deducted from the amount of its Judgment. The U.S. Marshal is also ordered to collect its costs and expenses, sell the propery, and provide proper notice of the sale. The sale date shall be set within thirty days of this Order. Excess proceeds, if any, after satisfation of expenses shall be paid to defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/17/2013. (jak)
June 10, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc against Dixon Farms Inc. & Ray Dixon, pursuant to 33 Amended Order, in the amount of $120,556.55, plus post-judgment interest of.36% until paid. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/10/2010. (jct)
June 9, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 15 Order granting Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. summary judgment against Dixon Farms, Inc. & Ray Dixon, it is awarded damages, costs and attorney's fees in the amount of $120,556.55. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/2010. (jct)
April 12, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion for default judgment on the issue of liability as to the third equipment lease is granted, & the issue of damages will be determined at a separate hearing to be scheduled by Wells Fargo. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/12/2010. (jct)
July 23, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability & Motion for Order of Delivery of Leased Equipment. Wells Fargo is entitled to summary judgment on liability for its breach of contract claim against each Defendant Dixon Farms, Inc. & Ray Dixon. Wells Fargo is entitled to an Order of Delivery entitling Wells Fargo to immediate possession of the following: (a) 2004 John Deere Tractor, Serial No. RW8120P010417; (b) 2003 John Deere Field Cultivator, Serial No. N00980X 009689; (c) John Deere GPS & DDP Ditcher; (d) 1992 John Deere Cotton Stripper S/N 7445X00807; (e) 2001 Model 7410 John Deere Tractor; & (f) 1999 Model 8400 John Deere Tractor S/N RW8400P022267. In the event that Defendants do not deliver the aforeme ntioned personal property to Wells Fargo w/i 7 days, this Order of Delivery shall be served by the Sheriff of Mississippi County, Arkansas, to obtain possession of the personal property & deliver same to Wells Fargo at Defendants' expense. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/23/09. (jct)
May 6, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion of Bradley E. Trammell for Leave to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc v. Dixon Farms Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Represented By: Bradley E. Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixon Farms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?