Morgan v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: William Morgan
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2009cv00057
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 MOTION to Substitute Mary F. Lin as counsel of record for deft in place of Oneil J. Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/23/10. (vjt)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 18 Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs; granting 20 Amended Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs. The Commissioner is directed to certify & pay Anthony W Bartels, attorney for Plaintiff, the amount of $2,192.21, which is awarded as fees & costs pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/1/2010. (jct)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT, pursuant to 16 Order entered this date, this case is remanded as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/24/09. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 MOTION to Extend Time. Plaintiff's Brief deadline is extended to & including 9/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/20/09. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Morgan
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?