Twitty v. Easterday et al

Plaintiff: James R Twitty
Defendant: Steven D Easterday, Thomas A Halleck, Jr, Tamara S Halleck, T And T Farms Inc and John Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00072
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 46 Order entered this date, James R. Twitty's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2011. (jct)
May 26, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Robert "Bobby" Coleman, Don Prevallet, and James R. Twitty to bring their laptop computers and cell phones including smart phones into the Courthouse for the scheduled 26 May hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/26/2011. (mkf)
February 16, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER, pursuant to the stipulations of the parties, the proper Defendants in this case are Steven D. Easterday & his employer, T and T Farms, Inc. The remaining Defendants, Thomas A Halleck, Jr, Tamara S Halleck & John Does are hereby dismissed from this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/16/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitty v. Easterday et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Twitty
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D Easterday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Halleck, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara S Halleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T And T Farms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?