Sullivan & Associates LLC v. Holladay

Plaintiff: Sullivan & Associates LLC
Defendant: Jeromy Daniel Holladay
Case Number: 3:2009cv00079
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 34 Order, in favor of Sullivan & Associates LLC against Jeromy Daniel Holladay in the amount of $17,704.32, plus post-judgment interest to accrue at 0.26% per annum, for all of which garnishment & execution may issue. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/2010. (jct)
June 25, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 28 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Sullivan & Associates LLC against Jeromy Daniel Holladay in the amount of $28,001.00 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.30% per annum. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/25/10. (vjt)
February 16, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 15 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Jeromy Daniel Holladay. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/16/2010. (jct)
February 10, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 2/8/10 damages hearing being continued due to inclement weather, a new hearing date will be set by separate notice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/10/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan & Associates LLC v. Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sullivan & Associates LLC
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeromy Daniel Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?