Parks v. Community Health Systems Inc et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Parks
Defendant: Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care LLC, Kevin Thielemier, Susan Sanders and Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00103
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/21/2010. (jct)
December 10, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 MOTION to Extend Time to File dispositive motions filed by Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended up to & including 12/17/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/10/09. (jct)
November 17, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Community Health Systems Inc., & it is hereby dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/17/09. (jct)
October 8, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff up to & including 11/11/09 in which to file an additional response to 26 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Community Health Systems Inc. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/8/09. (jct)
July 9, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Transfer Case to the Jonesboro Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Community Health Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Parks
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care LLC
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Thielemier
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Sanders
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?