Howard v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jamie Leah Howard
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2009cv00108
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 21 Memorandum and Order, in favor of Jamie Leah Howard, reversing the decision of the Commissioner & remanding this case as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/29/2011. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
April 21, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/21/2010. (jct)
April 5, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 2 Complaint filed by Jamie Leah Howard indicating she "is a resident of Ripley County, of the Southeastern Division of the Eastern District of Missouri, this case shall be IMMEDIATELY TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/5/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Leah Howard
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?