Reassure America Life Insurance Company v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: Reassure America Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Carolyn Turner, Stacy Mireles and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00133
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS, pursuant to settlement between the remaining parties to this action, directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse $3,000 to Defendant Stacy Mireles, plus 30% of interest accrued on the principal deposit, & to disburs e $7,000 to Defendant Carolyn Turner, plus 70% of interest accrued on the principal deposit. Pursuant to the parties' agreement, Defendant Carolyn Turner will pay court costs. The Court notes that a 10% registry fee will be deducted from the accrued interest. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/1/2010. (jct)
March 24, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Defendant Carolyn Turner's Motion for Summary Judgment & 27 Motion for Ruling. The Court will enter an amended initial scheduling order following entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/24/2010. (jct)
December 29, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 MOTION to Extend Time to file Rule 26(f) Report. The deadline is cancelled & a new deadline, if necessary, will be reset after a decision on Defendant Turner's motion for summary judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defenda nt Mireles has up to & including 14 days from the entry date of this Order in which to file a response to 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn Turner. If Defendant Mireles fails to respond, all material facts set forth in Turner's affidavit in support of summary judgment will be deemed admitted, & summary judgment, if appropriate, will be entered in Defendant Turner's favor. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant Stacy Mireles by regular mail & certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/09. (jct)
October 8, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT granting 14 Joint MOTION for Judgment Regarding Reassure America Life Insurance Company. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Reassure America Life Insurance Company is hereby dismissed with prejudice from any further p roceedings in this action. This action shall proceed solely between the claimants Carolyn Turner and Stacy Mireles. This Court expressly directs that the discharge and dismissal of Reassure is a final order pursuant to Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/8/09. (jct)
September 9, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to appear pro hac vice by David L. Hamblen on behalf of Defendant Carolyn Turner. Unless otherwise ordered, local counsel will not be required. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/9/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reassure America Life Insurance Company v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reassure America Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Herbert C. Rule, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Mireles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?