Russell v. St Bernards Hospital Inc

Plaintiff: Crissy Russell
Defendant: St Bernards Hospital Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv00147
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, (Bench Trial rescheduled for 4/18/2011 at 9:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4D before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/2011. (jct)
October 27, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/27/2010. (jct)
September 8, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the 9/20/10 trial of this matter due to the Court's schedule. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate Order. The Court denies as moot 28 Joint MOTION to extend the deadline to file motions in limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/8/2010. (jct)
August 20, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Reports filed by Crissy Russell. The deadline for filing status reports is extended until seven days following the Court's decision on the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/20/2010. (jct)
August 5, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to 15 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment is hereby extended up to & including 8/13/10. (Status Report deadline is extended up to & including 8/23/10). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/5/2010. (jct)
May 19, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery & extend deadlines. (Discovery due by 7/2/2010, Motions due by 7/16/2010, Status Report due by 8/5/2010) Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/2010. (jct)
April 5, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential documents in this cause of action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/2010. (jct)
February 17, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential documents in this cause of action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/17/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. St Bernards Hospital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crissy Russell
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Bernards Hospital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?