Nightingale v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Arnell Nightingale
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2009cv00166
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Arnell Nightingale. Plaintiff's complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/16/2011. (jct)
December 15, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for sanctions. Plaintiff will be precluded from introducing at trial any medical bills or records not produced before the discovery cut-off. Further, Plaintiff is required to produce any & all medical & pharmacy bills to which she will testify at least one month in advance of the trial. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/15/2010. (jct)
July 27, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue. The case is removed from the 9/13/10 trial docket & will be re-set by separate order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/27/2010. (jct)
May 7, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $750.00 to be paid by plaintiff. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/7/10. (bkp)
April 8, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, however, sanctions as set forth will be imposed. Plaintiff will be precluded from presenting at trial any medical evidence not provided in Plaintiff's original Rule 26 disclosures. Furthe r, Plaintiff is directed to provide addresses & contact information for all medical care providers & all witnesses identified in the discovery responses. The Court will allow an extension of the discovery deadline sufficient to complete the depositi ons of those named individuals. Plaintiff is directed to appear for deposition at a place & time designed by Defendant w/i 3 weeks of the entry of this Order. Defendant is directed to submit a motion for expenses with counsel's affidavit setting forth expenses caused by Plaintiff's failure to provide full & complete responses to the discovery requests as ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/8/2010. (jct)
March 17, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to provide full & complete responses to the outstanding discovery requests within 15 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/17/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nightingale v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnell Nightingale
Represented By: Scott A. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?