Moffitt et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA

Plaintiff: Donald Moffitt and Phyllis Moffitt
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2009cv00170
Filed: October 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/24/2010. (jct)
February 5, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions to Dismiss. The 2/9/10 hearing is removed from the Court's docket. A new hearing date will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/5/2010. (jct)
December 18, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Joint MOTION to Extend Initial Scheduling Order. The due date for the Rule 26(f) Report is hereby extended to two weeks from the date upon which this Court issues its Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Further, the Court grants Defendant's request to submit a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/18/09. (jct) Modified on 12/18/2009 to correct typographical error (jct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffitt et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Moffitt
Represented By: Debra J. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Moffitt
Represented By: Debra J. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Bradley E. Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?