Williams v. Recontrust Company NA et al

Plaintiff: April L Williams
Defendant: Recontrust Company NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Countrywide Home Loans Inc and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00180
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 40 Order entered this date, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/16/2010. (jct)
January 13, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement. The case is not dismissed but Plaintiff is directed to supply a more definite statement in an amended complaint pursuant to this Order. The substituted and amended complaint must be filed by 5 p.m., January 27, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/2010. (jct)
November 30, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, For a More Definite Statement filed by Countrywide Home Loans Inc, ReconTrust Company NA, advising Plaintiff if a response is not filed by 12/7/09, the motion will be granted. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/30/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Recontrust Company NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April L Williams
Represented By: Sara Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company NA
Represented By: Diana Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc
Represented By: Diana Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?