Williams et al v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Walter Williams, Bobby Posey and Dann M Parker
Defendant: Dick Busby, Zane Boyd, Teresa Bonner and S Mobley
Case Number: 3:2009cv00216
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 34 Memorandum and Order entered this date, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/2010. (jct)
June 21, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs Walter Williams & Bobby Posey to notify this Court of their current addresses & their intent to continue with the prosecution of this action, pro se, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/21/2010. (jct)
March 4, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Dick Busby, Zane Boyd, Teresa Bonner & S Mobley, & directing the U.S. Marshal to serve said Defendants with the 2 Complaint & 16 Amended Complaint, without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/4/2010. (jct)
November 30, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs Bobby Posey & Dann M Parker to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or in forma applications within 15 days of the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/30/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dann M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?