Nichols v. Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc

Plaintiff: Judy Nichols
Defendant: Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv00224
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 43 Jury Verdict, in favor of Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc on the claims of Judy Nichols. The complaint of Judy Nichols is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/5/2011. (jct)
May 3, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Lucien R. Gillham, counsel for Plaintiff, to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Courthouse in Jonesboro between 5/3/11 & 5/4/11, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/3/2011. (jct)
May 2, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, due to flooding in northeast Arkansas & impassible roads/interstates, the Jury Trial of this case before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes is rescheduled for 5/3/2011 at 9:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/2011. (jct)
April 29, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Defendant's First Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/29/2011. (jct)
April 25, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the Jury Trial set for 5/2/2011 is rescheduled to begin at 10:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes. Counsel should be present thirty minutes prior to trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2011. (jct)
January 14, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, or alternatively, motion in limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/14/2011. (jct)
December 22, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response. Defendant's response to 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and/or Motion in Limine is extended up to & including 12/30/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/2010. (jct)
August 9, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Confidential Documents in this cause of action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Nichols
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hytrol Conveyor Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?