Nixon v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie J Nixon
Defendant: Larry Mills, Paulett Arnold, Andy Allison and Sucon Cox
Case Number: 3:2010cv00006
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 28 Order of Dismissal entered this date, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), this case is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, due to Plaintiff's failure to timely & properly comply wit h the Court's 5/12/10 Order. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Judgment & the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/20/2010. (jct)
May 12, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: 21 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration is GRANTED, & that t he 4/12/10 18 Order & 19 Judgment are VACATED. The Clerk is directed to REOPEN this case & refer to Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray for recommended disposition. The Clerk is to mail Plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis & Plaintiff shall file same within 30 days of entry of this Order. Plaintiff is reminded that this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, if he fails to timely & properly comply with this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/12/2010. (jct)
April 12, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), this case is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order of Dismissal & the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/12/2010. (jct)
February 11, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order & 7 Order to Plaintiff at the Craighead County Detention Center. Plaintiff is ordered to file his Second Amended Complaint, in compliance with instructions set forth in 7 Order, on or before 3/16/2010. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly do so will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/11/2010. (jct)
February 1, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, a Second Amended Complaint containing the information specified regarding Defendant Andy Allison. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to REFRAIN FROM DOCKETING any written discovery from Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/1/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie J Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulett Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sucon Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?