BancInsure Inc v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: BancInsure Inc
Defendant: C Greg Miller, Donna Miller, Louise Miller, Howard Eldridge, Donald L Parker, Sr, David Holbrook and Asa Crow
Case Number: 3:2010cv00013
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL, with prejudice, pursuant to settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/6/2011. (jct)
December 1, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Joint Motion to Stay. This case is hereby stayed as of the date of entry of this Order. It is further ORDERED that during the stay the parties shall file with the court every 90 days a status report regarding the related state court action. It is further ORDERED that any party to this case may petition the Court to dissolve the stay at any time. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/1/2010. (jct)
September 28, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER directing that Charles Christopher Miller, Personal Representative of the Estate of C. Greg Miller, deceased, be substituted for Defendant C. Greg Miller in this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/28/2010. (jct)
May 27, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER that once an executor or administrator has been appointed for the Estate of C. Greg Miller, said executor or administrator will be substituted as a named Defendant in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/27/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BancInsure Inc v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BancInsure Inc
Represented By: Richard L. Ramsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Greg Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L Parker, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?