IPSCO Tubulars Inc v. Ajax TOCCO Magnathermic Corporation

Plaintiff: IPSCO Tubulars Inc
Defendant: Ajax TOCCO Magnathermic Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00021
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2016 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Ajax's request for leave, 209 , to file a sur-reply memorandum in opposition to IPSCO's motion for fees and costs, 171 , is granted and Ajax is directed to file its sur-reply on or before January 20, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/2016. (jak)
January 5, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 208 Motion to reinstate 171 Motion. IPSCO's Motion for leave to file its previously-prepared memorandum in opposition to Ajax's original motion for leave to file a sur-reply 210 is granted and the Clerk is directed to docket IPSCO's proposed opposition attached as exhibit A to its reply 210 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/5/2016. (jak)
November 24, 2015 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Eighth Circuit affirmed the verdict of this case on March 4, 2015, but remanded for specific findings on damages because its review was "hindered without additional explaination". The parties were asked to submit proposed finding s of fact as to damages. Having reviewed the parties' proposed findings on damages, 198 and 201 , plaintiff IPSCO Tubulars, Inc's proposed findings, 198 are adopted as set forth in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/24/2015. (jak)
November 26, 2013 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 171 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 190 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/26/2013. (fcd)
October 31, 2013 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 172 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/31/2013. (jak)
September 25, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 169 Order, Judgment is entered in favor of IPSCO Tubulars Inc against Ajax TOCCO Magnathermic Corporation in the amount of $5,162,298.55. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/25/2013. (jak)
August 14, 2013 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to General Order No. 54, John Stringer and Will Ferrell are hereby authorized to bring electronic devices into the United States Courthouse in Helena, Arkansas, on Friday, August 16, 2013 for closing arguments. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/14/2013. (jak)
August 12, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to Amended General Order No. 54, Stephen J. Butler, Diane M. Goderre, Kimberly Ramundo, David Hernandez, Christopher McLaughlin, Lucas Franklin, Kevin Crass and Robert Ducatman are hereby authorized to bring electronic devices into the United States Courthouse in Helena, Arkansas, on Friday, August 16, 2013, for closing arguments. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/2013. (jak)
May 28, 2013 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the official transcript following the bench trial in this case to be completed no later than June 7, 2013. The parties are directed to file their written submissions simultaneously on July 17, 2013. Closing arguments will commence at 10:00 a.m. on August 16, 2013, in Courtroom 314, United States Courthouse, 617 Walnut Street, Helena, Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 05/28/2013. (jak)
April 30, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion in Limine and 118 Motion to Exclude. Because this is a bench trial, the determination as to whether the evidence should be excluded, along with what weight to give it, can be better made at trial. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/30/2013. (jak)
April 29, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to General Order No. 54, plaintiff IPSCO Tubulars, Inc. is hereby authorized to bring the following exhibits into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock, beginning Monday, May 6, 2013, and each day ther eafter until the trial is completed: Ex. 302 - Tubing (2 feet long X 2 3/8 inches in diameter), Casing (2 feet long X 4 inches in diameter), and cross-sections of pipe (2 feet long each); and Ex. 313 - Quench barrel and insert (quench barrel is 3 feet in diameter and weighs 50-60 pounds). Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/29/2013. (jak)
April 16, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing John Tull III, Stephen J. Butler, Kimberly E. Ramundo, Joseph B. Russell, Robert Steven Appleton, Jr., Sherry McGee Murphy, Kevin Crass, Rob Ducatman, Chris McLaughlin, Jeff Saks, Lucas Franklin, Alissa Hamman, John Stringer and Ge rry Jackson to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, small portable printer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Federal Courthouse in Little Rock beginning Modnay, May 6, 2013 and each day thereafter until the trial is completed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/16/2013. (jak)
April 11, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 IPSCO Tubulars Inc.'s Motion for Ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/11/2013. (jak)
April 2, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/02/2013. (jak)
March 11, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 03/11/2013. (jak)
February 5, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion to Clarify. Defendant is permitted to file its amended answer with affirmative defenses. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/5/2013. (jak)
November 19, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying 73 Third Amended Final Scheduling Order pursuant to 80 Telephone Conference. TMK IPSCO shall produce all documents required by 76 Order no later than November 30, 2012. TMK IPSCO shall disclose its expert witnesses and produc e reports on or before January 4, 2013. Ajax shall disclose its expert witnesses and produce reports on or before January 30, 2013. The deadline to depose expert witnesses is March 22, 2013 Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/2012. (jak)
May 15, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court FIRST AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential documents in this cause of action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/15/2012. (jct)
February 11, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Governing Confidentiality of Documents and Information in this cause of action; granting 34 MOTION for Protective Order. The Court retains jurisdiction to make such amendments, modifications & additions to this Stipulation and Order as it may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/11/2011. (jct)
December 15, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the constructive fraud count (count three) of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPSCO Tubulars Inc v. Ajax TOCCO Magnathermic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPSCO Tubulars Inc
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajax TOCCO Magnathermic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?