Fitzgerald v. Bonner et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel Fitzgerald
Defendant: Teressa Bonner, Busby, Zane Boyd, Smith, Vernon Smith, Beasley, Mobley, Lindsey Peterson, Mandy Childress, Schroder and J B Brown
Case Number: 3:2010cv00078
Filed: April 14, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 62 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Nathaniel Fitzgerald, construing those objections as a request for this Court to reconsider its dismissal of this action, the Court has considered plaintiff's objections & finds no basis for reconsidering its adoption in full of the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings & Recommended Disposition. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/31/2011. (jct)
May 20, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 59 Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants on all claims set forth herein. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/20/2011. (thd)
December 20, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Response to Motion filed by Nathaniel Fitzgerald, which has been construed as a Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of Defendants' summary judgment papers (docket entries, #37, #38 & #39). Plaintiff shall file, on or before 1/14/11, a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment & a Statement of Disputed Material Facts that comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.56, Local Rule 56.1 & the instructions set forth in the 11/29/10 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/20/2010. (jct)
November 29, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file, within 30 days of the entry of this Order, a Response & Statement of Disputed Material Facts to 37 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely & properly comply with this Order could result in all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/29/2010. (jct)
July 9, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to amend the docket sheet to reflect the correct names of defts., and directing the parties to complete discovery on or before September 29, 2010, and to file any dispositive motions on or before October 29, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/9/10. (bkp)
June 15, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Mobley, Smith, Vernon Smith, Beasley and J B Brown are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, because Plaintiff has failed to state claims against them; & Plaintiff shall PROCEED with his failure to protect & inadequate medical care claims against Defendants Bonner, Busby, Boyd, Peterson, Childress & Schrode r. This Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to issue summons for Defendants Bonner, Busby, Boyd, Peterson, Childress & Schroder, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, 13 Substituted Complaint & this Order on those six Defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/15/2010. (jct)
April 21, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, along with a prison calculation sheet, & a copy of 3 Order, advising that he has until 5/20/10 to comply with the Order. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly do so will result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/21/2010. (jct)
April 16, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a prison calculation sheet, which plaintiff shall either return or submit the $350 statutory filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. The 2 Complaint filed by Nathaniel Fitzgerald is hereby stricken from the record and the plaintiff is directed to file a substituted complaint within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/16/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Bonner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teressa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?