Wachter Electric Company v. Electrical Systems Inc et al

Plaintiff: Wachter Electric Company
Defendant: Electrical Systems Inc, Roberts & Schaefer Company and RLI Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00083
Filed: April 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal, pursuant to 67 Joint Stipulation of the parties, dismissing this action with prejudice, & all costs incurred shall be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/19/2012. (jct)
December 9, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Roberts & Schaefer Company's Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Electrical Systems, Inc.'s Motion to stay proceedings & compel arbitration; granting 40 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 3:10CV00083-SWW & Case No. 3: 10CV00140-DPM are hereby CONSOLIDATED & shall continue as a single case under the lead case, Case No. 3:10CV00083-SWW. The parties are advised that all filings should be made only in the lead case, & the Clerk is directed to file this Order in both cases. The consolidated cases are hereby STAYED pending the outcome of arbitration between Wachter Electric Company & Electrical Systems, Inc., & the parties are directed to file a status report w/i 10 days after conclusion of arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/9/2010. (jct)
April 28, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Leslie Ann Boe; granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Darcy Victoria Hennessy, on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/28/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wachter Electric Company v. Electrical Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wachter Electric Company
Represented By: Leslie A. Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrical Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts & Schaefer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?