Ray v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Sterling Ray
Defendant: Larry Norris, Arkansas Department of Correction, David B Eberhard, Department of Community Corrections, Correctional Medical Services Inc, Wendy Spanos and John Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv00093
Filed: April 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Each party will bear its own fees & costs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2011. (jct)
June 8, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Plaintiff's motion to dismiss his claims against Dr. Spanos without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2011. (jct)
October 25, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, with a qualification, 29 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Sterling Ray. The Clerk is directed to add Ray Hobbs as a Defendant in this case, in his official capacity as the Current Director of Arkansas Department of Correction. The substitution of Director Hobbs for former Director Norris is a partial one. The Court has allowed Ray's individual-capacity claim for money damages against Norris to proceed. Thus, Norris - individually - remains a Defendant in this case based on that claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/25/2010. (jct)
September 27, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court dismisses Ray's official-capacity claims for money damages against all State Defendants with prejudice. The Section 1983 official -capacity claim against Norris seeking injunctive relief is moot given Norris' recent retirement, but that claim may proceed against Norris' successor upon a proper substitution. The Section 1983 individual-capacity claim for injunctive re lief against Norris is dismissed as moot. The Section 1983 official-capacity claim against Eberhard seeing injunctive relief may go forward. The Section 1983 individual-capacity claims seeking money damages against Norris & Eberhard may go forward. The Section 1983 claims against the AR Department of Correction & the AR Department of Community Corrections are dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction over the state-law claims Ray filed under the AR Civil Rights Act, the AR Constitution & the AR Medical Malpractice Act against the State Defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/27/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Ray
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B Eberhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Community Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Spanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?