Electrical Systems Inc v. Western Surety Company

Plaintiff: Electrical Systems Inc
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00140
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal, pursuant to 67 Joint Stipulation of the parties filed in Lead Case 3:10-CV-00083-SWW, dismissing this action with prejudice, & all costs incurred shall be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/19/2012. (jct)
December 9, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 63 Order entered in 3:10CV00083-SWW, CONSOLIDATING Case No. 3:10CV00083-SWW & Case No. 3:10CV00140-DPM, which shall continue as a single case under the lead Case No. 3:10CV00083-SWW. The parties are advised that all filings shou ld be made only in the lead case, & the Clerk is directed to file this Order in both cases. The consolidated cases are hereby STAYED pending the outcome of arbitration between Wachter Electric Company & Electrical Systems, Inc., & the parties are directed to file a status report w/i 10 days after the conclusion of arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/9/2010. (jct)
August 4, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 & 8 Motions for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Darcy Victoria Hennessy & Leslie Anne Boe for Defendant. Ms. Hennessy & Ms. Boe must register with CM/ECF in the Eastern District of Arkasnas by 8/16/2010. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/4/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrical Systems Inc v. Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Systems Inc
Represented By: John I. Houseal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?