Williams v. Cullom

Plaintiff: Karlis Williams
Defendant: Sumner Cullom
Case Number: 3:2010cv00178
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Sumner Cullom against Karlis Williams, pursuant to 48 Order, & case is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/16/2011. (jct)
January 21, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 45 Motion to Stay; pltf is directed to file on or before 2/10/11 an Affidavit containing the info specified in the 12/22/10 Order 43 ; deft shall file his Reply on or before 3/14/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/21/11. (vjt)
November 9, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL granting in part & denying in part 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sumner Cullom. Plaintiff's 12 Request to Strike, which was included in his Response to the Motion to Dismiss is denied. Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims, Arkansas Constitutional claim & outrage claim are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff shall PROCEED with his diversity medical malpractice claim. Defendant shall file an Answer w/i 14 days of the entry of this Order. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order of Partial Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/9/2010. (jct)
September 27, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, a Response to 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sumner Cullom. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely comply with this Order could result in dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/27/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Cullom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumner Cullom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?