Hughes v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hughes
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2010cv00181
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT, pursuant to 18 Memorandum and Order entered this date, the final determination of the Commissioner is affirmed & Plaintiff's case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/22/2011. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. ( Defendant's Brief deadline is extended to & including 5/2/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 3/31/2011. (jct)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Plaintiff's counsel to file Plaintiff's Brief w/i 15 days of the entry date of this Order. Failure to do so will result in a contempt citation requiring Plaintiff's counsel to appear & show cause why he should not be held in contempt for failure to comply. (Plaintiff's Brief due by 1/14/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/31/2011. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hughes
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?