Nesby et al v. Boyd et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Nesby and Rodrigues Jones
Defendant: Zane Boyd, Teresa Bonner, Linsey Peters and S Mobley
Case Number: 3:2010cv00197
Filed: August 18, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 31 Order entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/2011. (jct)
December 30, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 23 Order entered this date, the claims of Marcus Nesby are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/30/2010. (jct)
December 1, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 13 Mail Returned, directing Plaintiff Jones to file notice of his new address & file his Amended Complaint w/i 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/1/2010. (jct)
August 26, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 6 Notice filed by Rodrigues Jones, the Clerk is directed to mail this Order, as well as a copy of Order 3 to Plaintiff Nesby, 1109 Arkansas Street, Earle, AR 72331, as well as to the Crittenden County Detention Facility. Plaintiff Nesby is reminded of his duty to promptly notify the Court of any change of address & that his failure to do so could result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/26/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesby et al v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Nesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigues Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linsey Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?