Chew v. American Greetings Corporation

Plaintiff: Eugene Chew, Jr
Defendant: American Greetings Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00199
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 137 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment. The motion does not cite any extraordinary circumstances or newly discovered evidence; it simply restates plaintiffs' previous arguments, which were considered in the order granting summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/19/2013. (jak)
March 29, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' request for an expedited hearing on their 137 MOTION to set aside judgment. Given that plaintiffs' motion concerns the same issues addressed on summary judgment and that plaintiffs' time to appeal is tolled until disposition of the motion, an expedited hearing is not necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 03/29/2013. (jak)
September 14, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 66 Motion to Compel subject to parameters set forth within this Order. Site inspection is to occur no later than September 21, 2012, and the deadline for expert disclosures is extended to October 5, 2012.Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 09/14/2012. (jak)
December 8, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Deft's Motion to Compel as to the Hoskins; granting in part and denying in part 31 Deft's Motion to Compel as to the Duncans. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/8/11. (vjt)
August 3, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Continuance. Case 3:10cv199-BSM, designated as the lead case, is now consolidated with 3:10cv214-BSM & 3:11cv124-BSM. All future pleadings shall be filed in the lead case. Additionally, the request to continue the trial date is granted. A new scheduling order will be entered. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/3/2011. (jct)
August 2, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 & 18 Motions to Compel filed by American Greetings Corporation. David & Nancy Duncan and Eugene Chew are ordered to produce documents or to fully respond pursuant to this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/2/2011. (jct)
December 22, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Case No. 3:10CV00199-BSM & Case No. 3:10CV00214-BSM. Case No. 3:10CV00199-BSM is designated as the lead case & all future pleadings shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/22/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chew v. American Greetings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Chew, Jr
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Greetings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?