Larde v. USA

Plaintiff: Robert J Larde
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2010cv00212
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 21 Order entered on this day, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/17/2011. (dmn)
May 25, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 17 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Proper Service filed by USA, directing Plaintiff to respond to this pending motion, & provide proof that he has completed service upon the U.S. Attorney in Little Rock & the Attorney General of the U.S. in Washington, D.C., on or before 6/15/11. Failure to complete service or respond to the Court's Order may result in dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/25/2011. (jct)
April 19, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment filed by USA, & denying 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Robert J. Larde. Plaintiff has failed to execute service of process & Defendant is not in default. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/19/2011. (jct)
March 25, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward a copy of 7 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Robert J Larde, which the Court construes as a Motion for Clerk's Default, to the U.S. Attorney Christopher R. Thyer. Plaintiff's 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/25/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larde v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Larde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?