Stoner v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Tracy Stoner
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Correctional Medical Services Inc and John Maples
Case Number: 3:2010cv00218
Filed: September 13, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 99 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice, and all pending motions are moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/3/2014. (jak)
December 4, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based upond counsels' written representations to this Court, the pretrial telephone conference scheduled for tomorrow, Thursday, December 5, 2013, beginning at 9:00 a.m., is removed from the calendar. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/4/2013. (jak)
December 3, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based upon counsels' written representations to this Court, this case is removed from the trial calendar for the week of December 9, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/2013. (jak)
November 18, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERORR - DISREGARD (jak) (Docket text modified on 11/18/2013 to indicate the document was filed in error).(jak)
February 20, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/20/2013. (jak)
November 18, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/18/11. (vjt)
September 12, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information in this cause of action; granting 18 unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Arkansas Department of Correction, John Maples. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/12/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoner v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Stoner
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?